Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, May 2, 2022, 1:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Referred: General Laws(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|