Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2143 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 23, 2022
Fiscal Note January 24, 2022
Bill January 4, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 23, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022