House | 05/09/2022 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 05/05/2022 | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Referred: Insurance(H) | ||
House | 01/06/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2022 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | Prefiled (H) |