Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2154 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 6, 2022
Fiscal Note January 24, 2022
Bill January 4, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 6, 2022
Bill April 5, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022