LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Missouri MO
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2162
Draft Versions
MO
Missouri House Bill HB2162
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Missouri 2022 Regular Session
Missouri House Bill HB2162
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
May 24, 2022
Fiscal Note
April 6, 2022
Fiscal Note
January 26, 2022
Fiscal Note
January 10, 2022
Bill
January 4, 2022
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
January 26, 2022
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 16, 2022
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
May 13, 2022
Analysis
January 26, 2022
Analysis
January 14, 2022
Analysis
January 7, 2022
Substitute
Bill
March 31, 2022
Compare