House
|
06/30/2022
|
Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2022
|
Approved by Governor (G)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by President Pro Tem (S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by House Speaker (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 31 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 31 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 130 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 127 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
House Submits Conference Committee Report (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Senate Message (S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
House Message (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
House Distributes Conference Committee Report (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES PORTER, WIEMANN, GRIER, ELLEBRACHT, BUTZ
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - CRAWFORD, WIELAND, ESLINGER, ROBERTS, MOSLEY
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Taken Up
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Reported to the House with... (H) - SS SCS, as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 2, adopted AYES: 31 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
SS Adopted (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
SS Offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, May 3, 2022, 11:25 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 19, 2022, 3:00 p.m., Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Second read and referred: Insurance and Banking(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 134 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Referred: Insurance(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|