Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2168 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 3, 2022
Fiscal Note May 10, 2022
Fiscal Note May 5, 2022
Fiscal Note April 28, 2022
Fiscal Note March 2, 2022
Fiscal Note February 8, 2022
Fiscal Note January 28, 2022
Bill January 4, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 12, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis May 12, 2022
Bill April 28, 2022
Analysis March 2, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Bill February 8, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022

Conference Sub

Bill May 9, 2022

Substitute

Bill May 4, 2022