House | 04/14/2022 | Third Read and Defeated (H) - AYES: 51 NOES: 80 PRESENT: 9 | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted. | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | HCS Adopted (H) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Title of Bill - Agreed To | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Action Postponed (H) | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Executive Session Continued | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Referred: Workforce Development(H) | ||
House | 01/06/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2022 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | Prefiled (H) |