Senate | 05/10/2022 | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 111 NOES: 30 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Perfected (H) | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | HCS Adopted (H) | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Title of Bill - Agreed To | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Referred: Local Government(H) | ||
House | 01/06/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2022 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |