Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2177 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 27, 2022
Fiscal Note February 25, 2022
Fiscal Note February 14, 2022
Bill January 5, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 27, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Bill February 24, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022