Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2189 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 14, 2022
Fiscal Note February 28, 2022
Bill January 5, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 15, 2022
Bill March 8, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022