Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2206 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 10, 2022
Fiscal Note February 25, 2022
Bill January 5, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 21, 2022
Bill March 9, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022