Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2218 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 6, 2022
Fiscal Note February 25, 2022
Fiscal Note February 2, 2022
Bill January 5, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 6, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 8, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Bill February 24, 2022
Analysis January 20, 2022