House | 03/01/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 19 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Action Postponed (H) | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Executive Session Continued | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/06/2022 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |