Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2340 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 2, 2022
Fiscal Note January 27, 2022
Bill January 6, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 3, 2022
Bill March 1, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022