House | 05/09/2022 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |