Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 to HA 1, HA 1, as amended, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Taken Up
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Laid Over (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Referred: Public Safety(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|