Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2381 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 21, 2022
Fiscal Note February 3, 2022
Fiscal Note January 24, 2022
Bill January 11, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 26, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Bill February 1, 2022
Analysis January 20, 2022