Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 5, 2022, 8:15 a.m., Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Second read and referred: Small Business and Industry(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|