Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2382 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 21, 2022
Fiscal Note February 23, 2022
Fiscal Note February 8, 2022
Bill January 11, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 22, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Bill February 22, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022