House | 03/03/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Referred: Transportation(H) | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |