Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2445 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 1, 2022
Fiscal Note March 14, 2022
Bill January 13, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 30, 2022
Bill March 29, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022