Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2447 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 8, 2022
Fiscal Note January 31, 2022
Bill January 13, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 15, 2022
Bill March 8, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022