House | 05/09/2022 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 05/03/2022 | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Referred: Transportation(H) | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |