Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Second read and referred: Education(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 135 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA2, HA 3, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Motion to Reconsider Adopted (H) - Title AYES: 128 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Referred: Workforce Development(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|