Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2493 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 31, 2022
Fiscal Note February 3, 2022
Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 30, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 4, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022