Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2532 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 5, 2022
Fiscal Note February 4, 2022
Bill January 24, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 7, 2022
Bill April 5, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022