Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 26, 2022, 10:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Second read and referred: Insurance and Banking(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 132 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Referred: Insurance(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|