Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2566 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 14, 2022
Fiscal Note February 8, 2022
Bill January 26, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 14, 2022
Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022