Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2596 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 3, 2022
Fiscal Note February 4, 2022
Bill January 27, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 7, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022