House | 03/29/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Referred: Public Safety(H) | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |