Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2699 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 30, 2022
Fiscal Note February 27, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 4, 2022
Bill March 29, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022