House | 04/06/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Referred: Special Committee on Litigation Reform(H) | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |