Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2771 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 7, 2022
Fiscal Note March 28, 2022
Bill February 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 7, 2022
Bill April 6, 2022
Analysis March 24, 2022