House | 05/09/2022 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 9 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) | ||
House | 01/06/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2022 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | Prefiled (H) |