Senate | 04/14/2022 | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 97 NOES: 45 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Perfected (H) | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | HCS Adopted (H) | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Title of Bill - Agreed To | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |