Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HJR131 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 30, 2022
Fiscal Note March 14, 2022
Fiscal Note February 28, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 31, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 30, 2022
Analysis March 15, 2022
Bill March 10, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022