Senate | 05/11/2022 | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee w/SCS | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee (4383S.05C) | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee | ||
Senate | 01/05/2022 | S First Read | ||
Senate | 12/01/2021 | Prefiled |