House
|
06/27/2022
|
Signed by Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by House Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2022
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2022
|
H Third Read and Passed - EC defeated
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2022
|
HA 1 H offered & Ruled out of order (Person)--(3824S04.09H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Reported Do Pass H Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Voted Do Pass H Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Hearing Conducted H Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Referred H Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
SS, as amended, S adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Washington)--(3824S04.01S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
SS S offered (Luetkemeyer)--(3824S.04F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2021
|
Prefiled
|
|
|