LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Missouri MO
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR38
Draft Versions
MO
Missouri Senate Bill SJR38
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Missouri 2022 Regular Session
Missouri Senate Bill SJR38
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
June 2, 2022
Fiscal Note
March 9, 2022
Fiscal Note
January 10, 2022
Bill
December 2, 2021
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 8, 2022
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 17, 2022
Compare