House
|
05/13/2022
|
H Calendar Senate Joint Resolutions for Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Referred H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Reported Do Pass H Downsizing State Government
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Voted Do Pass H Downsizing State Government
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Hearing Conducted H Downsizing State Government
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Referred H Downsizing State Government
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported from S Governmental Oversight and Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/21/2021
|
Prefiled
|
|
|