Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 24, 2023, 12:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 and HA 3, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|