Senate | 04/20/2023 | Second read and referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment(S) | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 117 NOES: 23 PRESENT: 11 | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Perfected (H) | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | HCS Adopted (H) | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Title of Bill - Agreed To | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 2 | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred: Rural Community Development(H) | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |