House | 05/08/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 20 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |