Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Bill Not Heard
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 26, 2023, 9:15 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 3, 2023, 2:15 p.m., Senate Lounge
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second read and referred: Economic Development and Tax Policy(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 110 NOES: 39 PRESENT: 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred: Economic Development(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2023
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|