House | 05/11/2023 | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Referred: Transportation Infrastructure(H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/01/2022 | Prefiled (H) |