House | 05/01/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/01/2022 | Prefiled (H) |