Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second read and referred: Emerging Issues(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 104 NOES: 46 PRESENT: 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 and HA 2, adopted. AYES: 107 NOES: 41 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Bill Reconsidered (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Referred: General Laws(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2023
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|