House | 05/05/2023 | Reported Do Not Pass (H) - AYES: 2 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Motion to Do Pass Failed (H) | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Action Postponed (H) | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Executive Session Continued | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/01/2022 | Prefiled (H) |