House | 05/08/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Referred: Local Government(H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/01/2022 | Prefiled (H) |